skip to content

Elias, Andrew Michael

CPSO#: 95968

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Mar 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Forces Health Services
Centre Ottawa
713 Montreal Rd.
Ottawa ON  K1K0T1
Phone: 613-945-1111 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Andrew Elias Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 24 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:07 Mar 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW MICHAEL ELIAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELIAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 10 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2014