skip to content

Elia, Steven Theodore

CPSO#: 32037

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jun 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Oct 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York Endoscopy Centre
2 Champagne Drive
North York ON  M3H 5S4
Canada
Phone: (416) 645-5145
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Steven Elia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Elia ( CPSO# 32037 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEVEN THEODORE ELIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELIA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1980