skip to content

Elia, Mario Franco

CPSO#: 92895

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3090 Colonel Talbot Road - Unit 2
London ON  N6P 0B3
Phone: (519) 657-2032
Fax: (519) 657-3357 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mario Elia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Elia ( CPSO# 92895 )

Business Address:
2 - 3090 Colonel Talbot
London ON  N6P 0B3
Phone Number: (519) 657-2032

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARIO FRANCO ELIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012