skip to content

Elia, Eshay

CPSO#: 95914

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jan 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Assyrian, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
146 Oliver Rd
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone: (705) 653-1140
Fax: 7056535658 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queen's University
Department of Family Medicine
220 Bagot St
Kingston ON  K7L 3G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 533-9303
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

1455 Bath Road
Kingston ON  K7L 4V9
Canada
Phone: (613) 536-6047
Fax: (613) 536-6051
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Millhaven Institution
PO Box 280
Bath ON  K0H 1G0
Canada
Phone: (613) 351-8229
Fax: (613) 351-8230
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Eshay Elia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Elia ( CPSO# 95914 )

Business Address:
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Business Address:
1455 Bath Road
Kingston ON  K7L 4V9
Phone Number: (613) 536-6047

Business Address:
Highway 33
PO Box 280
Bath ON  K0H 1G0
Phone Number: (613) 351-8000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ESHAY ELIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2014