skip to content

Elghobary, Tamer

CPSO#: 97264

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Sep 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Prince Mohamed Bin Abdulaziz Hospit
Department of Surgery, 2nd floor
Al Imam Ahmed Bin Hanbal street
Riyadh 14124
Saudi Arabia

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Mary's Regional Cardiac Care
Centre
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tamer Elghobary Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2016
Corporation Name: Tamer Elghobary Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Elghobary ( CPSO# 97264 )

Business Address:
5628 Freshwater Dr
Mississauga ON  L5M 7N1
Phone Number: 6475173001

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective:21 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TAMER ELGHOBARY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELGHOBARY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 20 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
CF - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Feb 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2021