skip to content

Elgadi, Khaled Muftah

CPSO#: 84938

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Temiskaming Hospital
421 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Phone: (705) 647-1088 Ext. 2537
Fax: (705) 647-5405 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. K. Elgadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Elgadi ( CPSO# 84938 )

Business Address:
421 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Phone Number: (705) 647-1088

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KHALED MUFTAH ELGADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELGADI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011