skip to content

Elfiki, Tarek A

CPSO#: 85556

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Aug 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 11 Aug 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Al-Arab Medical University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Medical Oncology
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor ON  N8W 2X3
Phone: (519) 253-5253 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. TA Elfiki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Elfiki ( CPSO# 85556 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Medical Oncology
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor ON  N8W 2X3
Phone Number: (226) 350-0104


Corporation Name: 2209685
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Elfiki ( CPSO# 85556 )

Business Address:
2188 Serenity Cir
Lasalle ON  N9H 0C6
Phone Number: 22603500104

Business Address:
2188 Serenity Cir
Lasalle ON  N9H 0C6
Phone Number: 2263500104

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Oncology Effective:11 Aug 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Sep 2006 to 12 Nov 2006
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology

Western University, 13 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Medical Oncology

Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Medical Oncology

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 11 Jul 2008
CF - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Nov 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Feb 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Feb 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Feb 2012 Active
 Dr.  Tarek  A.  Elfiki may practise medicine independently in Medical Oncology,
            only.