skip to content

Elfassy, Sam

CPSO#: 86519

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 307
2333 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6R 1X6
Phone: (416) 766-3401
Fax: (416) 766-5076 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sam Elfassy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Elfassy ( CPSO# 86519 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:29 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAM ELFASSY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELFASSY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011