skip to content

Eldjama, Tarik

CPSO#: 97902

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Information is not available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tarik Eldjama Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Eldjama ( CPSO# 97902 )

Business Address:
19 Macstevens Drive
Picton ON  K0K 2T0

Business Address:
Harbourview Clinic
Suite 4
35 Bridge Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 476-3008

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record can contact the Prince Edward County Family Health Team at: 613-476-0400, 35 Bridge Street, Prince Edward, ON., K0K 2T0
Date Received: 02 Mar 2022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TARIK ELDJAMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELDJAMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014