skip to content

Elarabi, Mohamed Farouk Radwan

CPSO#: 97707

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Sep 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 11 Sep 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cleveland Clinic Abu Dhabi
Sowwah Square, Al Maryah Island
Abu Dhabi 112412
United Arab Emirates
Phone: 0097126590200 Ext. 68107
Fax: 0097126435377

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Egypt
United Arab Emirates

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Rheumatology Effective:11 Sep 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
PEAP - R - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 11 Sep 2015
CF - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jan 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jan 2018 Active
 Dr.  Mohamed  Farouk  Radwan  Elarabi  may  practise  medicine independently in
            rheumatology.