skip to content

Elantholi Parameswaran, Saibishkumar

CPSO#: 84856

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Apr 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Apr 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Calicut University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Elantholi Parameswaran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 12 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.


British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:01 Aug 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 08 Sep 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 09 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
International Specialist Physician - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Sep 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Sep 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Apr 2019