skip to content

El-Zein, Mohamad Abdul Karim

CPSO#: 92479

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 Nov 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Nov 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of Beirut, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta
Lebanon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 22 Mar 2010
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 23 Mar 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
CF - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Paediatric Radiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 30 Aug 2012 to 05 Nov 2012
PEAP - CF - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 06 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 05 Nov 2015
CF - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Nov 2015