skip to content

ElTobgy, Kamal Eldin Mohamed Asaad

CPSO#: 89645

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Bronte St S
Treehouse Pediatrics
Unit 302
Milton, ON, L9T 9M2
Phone: 905-876-5056
Fax: 289-670-2176

Additional Practice Location(s)

2-4100 Living Arts Dr
Phone: 905-270-5600
Fax: 905-270-8870
County: 
Electoral District: 

2-4100 Living Arts Dr
Living Arts Medical Centre
Phone: 905-270-5600
Fax: 905-270-8830
County: 
Electoral District: 

2-4100 Living Arts Dr
Living Arts Medical centre
Unit 2
Mississauga, ON, L5B0C3
Phone: 905-270-5600
Fax: 905-270-8830
County: 
Electoral District: 

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: ElTobgy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. ElTobgy ( CPSO# 89645 )

Business Address:
1-604 Santa Maria Boulevard
Building C
Milton ON  L9T 9L7
Phone Number: (905) 878-0055

Business Address:
Milton District Hospital
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Business Address:
2 - 4100 Living Arts Drive
Mississauga ON  L5B 0C3
Phone Number: (905) 270-5600


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Egypt

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAMAL ELDIN MOHAMED ASAAD ELTOBGY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELTOBGY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013