skip to content

El-Salfiti, Ismail Kamal

CPSO#: 95191

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Westend Family Care Clinic
80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Ottawa ON  K2M 1P6
Phone: (613) 599-3321
Fax: (613) 599-3366 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kemptville District Hospital
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Canada
Phone: (613) 258-6133
Fax: (613) 258-1225
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ismail El-Salfiti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. I. El-Salfiti ( CPSO# 95191 )

Business Address:
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-6133

Business Address:
The Westend Family Care Clinic
80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Ottawa ON  K2M 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 599-3321

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ISMAIL KAMAL EL-SALFITI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-SALFITI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013