skip to content

El-Rayes, Malak

CPSO#: 88249

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Feb 2023
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 06 Feb 2023

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1755 Boul René-Laennec
Hospital
Cardiology Department
RC 90
Laval QC  H7M 3L9
Phone: 4506681010 Ext. 23254

Additional Practice Location(s)

300-11800 Rue De Chaumont
Clinique Cité Mirabel
Mirabel QC  J7J 0T8
Canada
County: 
Electoral District: 

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MALAK EL-RAYES shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. EL-RAYES is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. EL-RAYES shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. EL-RAYES is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. EL-RAYES shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. EL-RAYES is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. EL-RAYES no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2023.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 05 May 2008 to 01 Jun 2008
EL - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 13 Feb 2012 to 11 Mar 2012
EL - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 06 Feb 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2023