skip to content

ElBohy, Manar Mouneer Eysa

CPSO#: 91245

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Mar 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Mar 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Site
2867 Ellesmere Rd
6th Floor
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: 4162848131 Ext. 5331
Fax: 4162817320 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Desouky El-Bohy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. ElBohy ( CPSO# 91245 )
Dr. H. Desouky ( CPSO# 99844 )

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Business Address:
61 Prince Charles Dr
North York ON  M6A 2H4
Phone Number: 6479091862

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MANAR MOUNEER EYSA ELBOHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELBOHY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2015