skip to content

El Rouby, Doaa Hussin Saad Eldin

CPSO#: 97108

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Catherines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A5
Phone: 6477005012 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Doaa El Rouby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. D. El Rouby ( CPSO# 97108 )

Business Address:
St. Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A5
Phone Number: (905) 354-2323

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DOAA HUSSIN SAAD ELDIN EL ROUBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL ROUBY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2012 to 23 Feb 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Feb 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017