skip to content

El Rayes, Maged Fouad Elias

CPSO#: 100368

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 06 Sep 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 May 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2019