skip to content

El Rakaiby, Galal Bahey El Din Abdel Aziz

CPSO#: 97451

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 May 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 May 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 May 2012 to 18 Jul 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Apr 2014
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 May 2015
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 2015