skip to content

El Boreky, Fadia Refaat Ramzy

CPSO#: 90022

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
149 Union Street East
Waterloo ON  N2J 1C4
Phone: (519) 569-8500
Fax: (519) 569-8506 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Fadia El Boreky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. F. El Boreky ( CPSO# 90022 )

Business Address:
164 Fergus Avenue
Kitchener ON  N2A 2H2
Phone Number: (519) 894-9600

Business Address:
149 Union Street East
Waterloo ON  N2J 1C4
Phone Number: (519) 569-8500

Business Address:
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311


Corporation Name: Sameh Fikry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:29 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FADIA REFAAT RAMZY EL BOREKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL BOREKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 20 Nov 2008 to 17 Dec 2008
EL - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2009