skip to content

Ekong, Enobong Inem Arit

CPSO#: 96950

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Jan 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
ActiveCare Medical Clinic
1108 Klondike Rd
Kanata ON  K2K 0G1
Phone: 613-254-9777
Fax: 613-254-9778 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sound Care Medical Centre
1145 Hunt Club Rd, Suite 560
Ottawa ON  K1V 0Y3
Canada
Phone: 613-738-2378
Fax: 613-738-2653
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Meadowlands Family Health Centre
888 Meadowlands Dr E.
Nepean ON  K2C 3R2
Canada
Phone: 613-228-2882
Fax: 613-228-2856
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Enobong Ekong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ekong ( CPSO# 96950 )

Business Address:
11
Kanata ON  K2K 1X7
Phone Number: 6132549777

Business Address:
Active Care Medical
1108 Klondike Rd
Kanata ON  K2K 1X7
Phone Number: 6132549777

Business Address:
Sound Care Medical Centre
560 - 1145 Hunt Club Road
Ottawa ON  K1V 0Y3
Phone Number: (613) 738-2378

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ENOBONG INEM ARIT EKONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EKONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2011 to 30 Nov 2011
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 09 Dec 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2020