skip to content

Eisen, Hillel David

CPSO#: 30253

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of 17 Jan 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 17 Jan 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Date of Death: 17-Jan-2019

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1977 to 12 Jun 1978
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 13 Nov 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2007
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2014
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 20 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 20 Apr 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2017
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 17 Jan 2019

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 13 Nov 2003
Summary:

 On November 13, 2003, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Hillel David Eisen committed 
 professional misconduct in that he engaged in acts relevant to the practice of medicine that 
 having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Committee ordered and directed that:

1.	Dr. Eisen attend 
 before it to be reprimanded.
2.	The fact of the reprimand be recorded on the register.
3.	The 
 Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Eisen(s certificate of 
 registration:

(1)	Dr. Eisen undertake at his own expense an assessment by the Quality Assurance 
 Committee (QAC) and abide by the QAC(s recommendations and comply with any terms, conditions and 
 limitations, which the QAC may impose on his certificate of registration.  The QAC will be 
 provided with the decision and reasons for decision of the Discipline Committee.

(2)	Dr. Eisen is 
 to successfully complete the next available College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario(s 
 (Physician-Patient Communication and Interviewing Skills( course at his own expense.

(3)	Dr. 
 Eisen is to successfully complete the next available College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
 Ontario(s (Understanding Boundaries and Preventing Boundary Violations in the Doctor-Patient 
 Relationship( course at his own expense.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 11, 2003