skip to content

Eiriksson, Lua Ruhiyyih

CPSO#: 89877

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Fax: (905) 575-6343 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

St. Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8M 1W9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: 905-521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: 905-521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: 905-521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Lua Eiriksson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Eiriksson ( CPSO# 89877 )

Business Address:
St Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8M 1W9
Phone Number: (905) 777-3837

Business Address:
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8M 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155


Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Engels Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Eiriksson ( CPSO# 89877 )
Dr. P. Engels ( CPSO# 92753 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
6 North Wing
Room 617
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Gynecologic Oncology Effective:26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LUA RUHIYYIH EIRIKSSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EIRIKSSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2008 to 19 Oct 2008
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 12 Jan 2009 to 08 Feb 2009
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2010