skip to content

Eidus, Leslie Bence

CPSO#: 30323

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Feb 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Juravinski Hospital 711 Concession Street Hamilton, ON L8V 1C3
Instructions: Records located at Juravinski Hospital
Date Received: 14 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:03 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Apr 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014