skip to content

Eid, Moustafa Reyad Ibrahim

CPSO#: 90712

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Tanta University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Front Avenue W
Brockville ON  K6V 4J2
Phone: (613) 342-2262 Ext. 5362
Fax: (613) 342-2435 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

75 Charles St
Brockville General Hospital
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Canada
Phone: (613) 345-5645
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Moustafa Eid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 4 2018
Corporation Name: Moustafa Eid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Eid ( CPSO# 90712 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOUSTAFA REYAD IBRAHIM EID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EID is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 19 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013