skip to content

Eichhofer, Jonas

CPSO#: 85960

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 27 Apr 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Rhenish Frederick William Univ of Bonn, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Feb 2007 to 25 Apr 2007
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 26 Apr 2007 to 31 Jan 2008
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2008