skip to content

Ehsan, Saima

CPSO#: 94094

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Pashto, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone: (905) 336-9630
Fax: (905) 336-9626 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Saima Ehsan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ehsan ( CPSO# 94094 )

Business Address:
Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone Number: (289) 336-9630

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:21 Sep 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAIMA EHSAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EHSAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 24 Dec 2010
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 25 Dec 2010 to 26 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 27 Sep 2011 to 24 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Dec 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012