Egeler, Rudolph Maarten (CPSO#: 97037)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:State University of Leiden, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 555 University Avenue, Toronto, ON M5G 1X8
Date Received: 16 May 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Netherlands

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Nov 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Nov 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016