skip to content

Edwards, Jacqueline Elizabeth

CPSO#: 97977

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Mar 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 109
109 Regina Ave
Thunder Bay ON  P7B5B4
Phone: (807) 344-0105
Fax: (807) 344-0135 Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE ELIZABETH EDWARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDWARDS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 24 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2015