skip to content

Edwards, Dale Virginia

CPSO#: 23934

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jul 1971
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 1971

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
42 Camden Street #802
Toronto ON  M5V 1V1
Phone: (647) 293-0702
Fax: (647) 345-0718 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DALE VIRGINIA EDWARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDWARDS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1971