skip to content

Smith, Edward James

CPSO#: 33838

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 04 Oct 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 08 Feb 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Edward J. Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Smith ( CPSO# 33838 )

Business Address:
109 - 460 St. Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1K 4Z2
Phone Number: (613) 748-1113


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1982
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 08 Feb 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 04 Oct 2019
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 04 Oct 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 04 Oct 2019


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Discipline Committee Effective: 04 Oct 2019 Active

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Jul 2019
Summary:

On July 12, 2019, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Edward James Smith committed an act of 
professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the 
practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, and has failed to maintain the standard of 
practice of the profession. 

Disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct 

In 2010, the College’s Out-of-Hospital Premises Inspection Program (OHPIP) was created by Regulation 
114/94 to the Medicine Act.  All members had 60 days to notify OHPIP if they were performing the 
procedures outlined in the Regulation. Dr. Smith wrote to the College providing a list of procedures he 
performed in his family practice.  Based on his list of procedures, Dr. Smith fell within the ambit of the 
program and was required to comply with OHPIP Standards.  He was informed that his premises would 
have to be inspected and would have to be approved as an Out-of-Hospital premises (OHP).  Shortly 
after being notified of this requirement, Dr. Smith communicated with College staff and advised them 
that he was not in fact providing any OHP procedures to his patients and that no inspection was 
required.  Based on information provided by Dr. Smith, no inspection was ever conducted and his office 
was not approved as an OHP. 

In 2016, the College received information that another physician was performing OHP interventional 
pain management procedures in Dr. Smith’s office.  This information triggered a College investigation, 
during which it was determined that, despite what he had told the OHPIP, Dr. Smith was in fact himself 
performing OHP interventional pain management procedures. OHPIP conducted an inspection that 
disclosed multiple deficiencies in Dr. Smith’s unapproved premises, including a failure to meet general 
physical standards, failure to meet medication standards and failure to meet staffing requirements, all 
of which are mandated in OHPIP Standards.   

OHIP data established that Dr. Smith billed OHIP for OHPIP procedures between 2011 and 2017. 

Failure to maintain the Standard of Practice 

The College ‘s expert outlined multiple deficiencies in Dr. Smith’s practice.  Providing OHP procedures in 
an unapproved setting is an unsafe practice, particularly in light of the multiple deficiencies identified in 
the OHPIP inspection. The expert also concluded that Dr. Smith displayed a lack of judgment and 
knowledge in performing high-risk OHP procedure in an unapproved setting, without adequate staffing, 
equipment and adequate means or expertise to treat potential life-threatening complications.  

Disposition 
 
On October 4, 2019, the Discipline Committee ordered that: 
-  The Registrar suspend Dr. Smith’s certificate of registration for a period of seven 
   months, to commence on the date of this order; 
-  The Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Smith’s 
   certificate of registration: 
   o  Dr. Smith shall comply with College Policy #2-07 “Practice Management 
      Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practice, Take an Extended Leave of 
      Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation”. 
   o  Dr. Smith will successfully complete the PROBE course in ethics and professionalism 
      at his own expense, within 6 months of the date of this Order, or any alternative 
      course in ethics and professionalism approved by the College. Dr. Smith will agree 
      to abide by any recommendations of the PROBE program and provide proof of 
      completion to the College. 
-  Dr. Smith shall appear before the Committee to be reprimanded; 
-  Dr. Smith pay to the College costs in the amount of $10,370.00 within 30 days of the date of this 
   Order.

Hearing Date(s): July 12, 2019

The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.