skip to content

Edington, Richard Bruce

CPSO#: 33587

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1982
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
118 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 2G9
Phone: (519) 364-2820
Fax: (519) 364-3965 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hanover And District Hospital
90 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 1N1
Canada
Phone: (519) 364-2340
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R. Bruce Edington Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Edington ( CPSO# 33587 )

Business Address:
118 - 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 2G9
Phone Number: (519) 364-2820

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RICHARD BRUCE EDINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDINGTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1982

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

On February 20, 2014, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in London, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Richard B Edington in respect of an incident that took place in December 2008.