skip to content

Eddy, Allison Audrey

CPSO#: 29047

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jan 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: McMaster University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALLISON AUDREY EDDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDDY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Dec 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2022