skip to content

Earle, John Macgregor

CPSO#: 29184

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jun 2021
EXPIRY DATE
10 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital 3045 Baseline Rd Nepean,ON K2H 8P4
Date Received: 09 Jun 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:01 Nov 1982 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 2021