skip to content

Eakins, Thomas Stephen Garvin

CPSO#: 26047

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Stephen Eakins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 26 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:06 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012