skip to content

Wang, Elaine Ee-Ling

CPSO#: 52231

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, French

Education:McGill University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Peter P. Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Liu ( CPSO# 32340 )
Dr. E. Wang ( CPSO# 52231 )

Business Address:
TGH, University Health Network
NCSB 11-1266
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 505-2132

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Room H-2238
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 696-7000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 03 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019