skip to content

Torbicki, Edward Alphonse

CPSO#: 51930

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Dec 1987
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Dec 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Anaesthesia Associates
439 Park Street
2nd Floor
Kitchener ON  N2G 1N4
Phone: (519) 744-7361
Fax: (519) 744-7363 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 2242
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

St Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 744-3311 Ext. 6485
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Dr Jeffery Wallace
#201- 60 Bridgeport Road E
Waterloo ON  N2J 2J9
Canada
Phone: (519) 884-2500
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Edward Torbicki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Torbicki ( CPSO# 51930 )
Dr. E. Torbicki ( CPSO# 109326)

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
K-W Health Centre
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
Anesthesia Associates
439 Park Street - 2nd Floor
Kitchener ON  N2G 1N4
Phone Number: (519) 744-7361

Business Address:
Dr. Jeffrey Wallace
60 Bridgeport Road East
Kitchener ON  N2J 2J9
Phone Number: (519) 884-2500

Medical Records Location

Address: Grand River Hospital, 835 King St W, Kitchener, Ontario N2G 1G3 St Mary's General Hospital, 911 Queen's Blvd, Kitchener, Ontario N2M 1B2
Date Received: 03 Jun 2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 21 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EDWARD ALPHONSE TORBICKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TORBICKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Jan 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1987