skip to content

Talikowska-Szymczak, Ewa Maria

CPSO#: 100509

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph Family Health Team
55 Wyndham Street North
Suit 212 Old Quebec Street Mall
Guelph, ON
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone: (519)-837-4444 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

University of Waterloo
Health Services
200 University Avenue West
Waterloo N2L 3G1
Canada
Phone: (519) 888-4096
County: 
Electoral District: 

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Szymczak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Szymczak ( CPSO# 87028 )
Dr. E. Talikowska-Szymczak ( CPSO# 100509)

Business Address:
160 St. David Street South
Fergus ON  N1M 2L3
Phone Number: (519) 787-1800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EWA MARIA TALIKOWSKA-SZYMCZAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TALIKOWSKA-SZYMCZAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
AVP - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018