skip to content

Stone, Erin Keely

CPSO#: 84350

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Primrose Family Medicine Centre
35 Primrose Ave
Ottawa ON  K1R 0A1
Phone: (613) 230-7788
Fax: (613) 230-7778 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Stone-Rutherford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Stone ( CPSO# 84350 )
Dr. M. Stone ( CPSO# 30004 )
Dr. M. Stone ( CPSO# 91439 )
Dr. D. Rutherford ( CPSO# 30774 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
86 Angeline Street South
Lindsay ON  K9V 6C5
Phone Number: (705) 324-5870


Corporation Name: Low & Stone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Stone ( CPSO# 84350 )
Dr. T. Low ( CPSO# 84392 )

Business Address:
Monfort Hospital
ICU Medicine and Emergency Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
35 Primrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1R 0A1
Phone Number: (613) 230-7788

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERIN KEELY STONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STONE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008
The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.