skip to content

Park, Edward Kyu Yol

CPSO#: 95868

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: Park, Kyu Yol Edward (used until: 07 Mar 2012 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104, 581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 898-2444
Fax: (905) 898-5558 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Edward Park Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Park ( CPSO# 95868 )

Business Address:
104 - 581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EDWARD KYU YOL PARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.