skip to content

Kaplovitch, Eric Michel

CPSO#: 103739

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital-UHN
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: 416-603-5800 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto General Hospital-UHN
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: 416 340 4800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: 416-756-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 596-4200
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERIC MICHEL KAPLOVITCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPLOVITCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018