skip to content

Huang, Eileen Yi-Li

CPSO#: 29916

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 May 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 May 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7628
Fax: (905) 848-0348 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Partners
Queensway Hospital
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Canada
Phone: (416) 521-4011
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Eileen Yi-Li Huang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Huang ( CPSO# 29916 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 22 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EILEEN YI-LI HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1978