skip to content

Hooper, Elizabeth Diana

CPSO#: 50793

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Erie Shores Healthcare
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone: (519) 322-2501 Ext. 4417 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Elizabeth Hooper Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Southcott ( CPSO# 110997)
Dr. E. Hooper ( CPSO# 50793 )
Dr. J. Southcott ( CPSO# 31853 )

Business Address:
1568 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 1K7
Phone Number: (519) 256-4358

Business Address:
10 - 13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone Number: (519) 979-0111

Business Address:
Leamington Hospital
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 322-2501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 11 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH DIANA HOOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOOPER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1986