skip to content

Fong, Edwin Matthew Y.C.

CPSO#: 81014

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: 9055085911
Fax: 9055082972 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Edwin Fong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fong ( CPSO# 22125 )
Dr. E. Fong ( CPSO# 81014 )

Business Address:
York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-2310

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 853-2216

Business Address:
201-13291 Yonge Street
2nd Floor
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
101-9401 Jane Street
Vaughan ON  L6A 4H7
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
205-250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 508-5911

Business Address:
3200 Major Mackenzie drive West
Vaughan ON  L6A 4Z3
Phone Number: 9058834554

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EDWIN MATTHEW Y.C. FONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008