skip to content

David, Elizabeth N

CPSO#: 71504

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Imaging
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 2363
Fax: (416) 480-6032 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: E. N. David Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. E. David ( CPSO# 71504 )

Business Address:
Department of Medical Imaging
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4358


Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 4 2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH N DAVID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVID is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002