skip to content

Cordeiro, Erin Doris

CPSO#: 98640

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Box 202
Ottawa ON  K1M 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8428
Fax: (613) 737-8371 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Timothy Olynych Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Olynych ( CPSO# 96545 )
Dr. E. Cordeiro ( CPSO# 98640 )

Business Address:
110 - 2935 Conroy Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 6C6
Phone Number: (613) 725-2113


Corporation Name: Dr. Erin Cordeiro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Olynych ( CPSO# 96545 )
Dr. E. Cordeiro ( CPSO# 98640 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8428

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERIN DORIS CORDEIRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORDEIRO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2012