skip to content

Dziak, Peter Michael

CPSO#: 95744

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Feb 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Peter Dziak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 13 2019
Corporation Name: Peter Dziak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 10 2021

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  November 26, 2018
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On December 17, 2018, Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win Health Centre (SLHC) notified the College, pursuant to s. 33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that the locum privileges held by Dr. Peter Dziak at SLHC were suspended effective November 26, 2018, and that his appointment at SLHC terminated effective December 31, 2018.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:10 Oct 2017 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2013
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 15 Feb 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 15 Feb 2019 Active
             As from February 15, 2019, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Peter Michael Dziak
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Dziak to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        Dr. Dziak has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all
                        jurisdictions.  
                  

Concerns

Source: Other
Active Date: March 23, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
FINDINGS OF GUILT
Peter Dziak was found guilty of the following offences:

(1) Criminal Harassment, contrary to Section 264(1) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
(2) Failing to comply with an undertaking to an officer, contrary to Section 145(5.1) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date: March 23, 2021
Sentencing had not yet occurred as of the date of posting.

 

Source: Other
Active Date: December 18, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective December 4, 2014, the College By-laws require members to report to the College any currently existing conditions of release (“bail conditions”) following a charge for a criminal or provincial offence or subsequent to a finding of guilt and pending appeal.

The following are conditions of release made against this member:

[December 12, 2018]

1. Reside at specified address;

2. Remain in your residence daily except/unless in the presence of specified persons;

3. Remain in Toronto, ON except for required court appearances;

4. Not to contact or communicate in any with either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with specified persons;

5. Not to possess any weapon(s) as defined by the Criminal Code of Canada;

6. Not to have any access to the internet.

 

Source: Other
Active Date: November 30, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
CHARGES
Peter Dziak was charged with the following offence:

1. Criminal Harassment on or about November 28, 2018 at the City of Thunder Bay, contrary to Section 264(1) of the Criminal Code.

Date of charges: November 30, 2018
Place of charges: Thunder Bay, Ontario
Thunder Bay Police Service