skip to content

Dzever, Andrijana

CPSO#: 99344

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Dec 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
85 The East Mall
Toronto ON  M8Z 5W4
Phone: (416) 621-2220
Fax: 416 621-2203 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDRIJANA DZEVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DZEVER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 29 Oct 2012 to 20 Jan 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2014