skip to content

Dzaja, Nancy

CPSO#: 86963

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
89 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone: (519) 265-7477
Fax: (519) 265-6006 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lin Dzaja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lin ( CPSO# 86947 )
Dr. N. Dzaja ( CPSO# 86963 )

Business Address:
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone Number: (519) 824-1010

Business Address:
89 Dawson Road
Suite 208
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 265-7477

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:31 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NANCY DZAJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DZAJA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2012