skip to content

Dye-Torrington, Debra Angelia

CPSO#: 86159

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Guyana, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Subspecialty Clinic
2025 Midland Avenue East
Suite 300
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Phone: (647) 341-3832
Fax: (647) 341-3830 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 348-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

27 Tapscott Rd
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y7
Canada
Phone: 416-644-3536
Fax: 416-644-3542
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Debra Dye-Torrington Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dye-Torrington ( CPSO# 86159 )

Business Address:
Scarborough Subspecialty Clinic
300-2025 Midland Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Phone Number: (647) 341-3832

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DEBRA ANGELIA DYE-TORRINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DYE-TORRINGTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2011